Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Licensed Tree Expert - License Renewal - Continuing Education Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Bobo, Glenn, Lafferty, and S. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a licensed tree expert to complete specified continuing education requirements to qualify for license renewal; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to maintain specified records for each licensed tree expert; requiring the Department to update specified records when a document of completion is approved; requiring the Department to mail a renewal application form to a licensed tree expert under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0692
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM