Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Exemptions from Higher Education Ethics Requirements and Procurement Rules to Facilitate Technology Transfer
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Maryland Economic Development and Business Climate Commission) and Delegates Beitzel, Davis, Jones, Adams, Barkley, Branch, Brooks, Carey, Chang, Clippinger, Fisher, Frick, Glenn, Haynes, Hettleman, Jackson, Jameson, Kramer, Lisanti, Mautz, A. Miller, B. Robinson, Valderrama, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Exemptions from Higher Education Ethics Requirements and Procurement Rules to Facilitate Technology Transfer; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to review, study, and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015; providing for the termination of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0773
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Reassigned to Economic Matters and Appropriations
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {193898/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {617672/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Reassigned to Economic Matters and Appropriations 25
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments {193898/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 48
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 3/30/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Favorable with Amendments {617672/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 53
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM