Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Restructuring
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Maryland Economic Development and Business Climate Commission) and Delegates Beitzel, Davis, Jones, Adams, Barkley, Branch, Brooks, Carey, Clippinger, Frick, Glenn, Jameson, Kramer, Lisanti, Valderrama, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Renaming the Department of Business and Economic Development to be the Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce; renaming the Secretary of Economic Development to be the Secretary of Commerce; establishing an Office of the Secretary of Commerce in the Office of the Governor; specifying that the Secretary is the head of the economic development policy; establishing the Public-Private Partnership Marketing Corporation to create a branding strategy, attract new business to the State, and other specified purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0776
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {533892/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kramer) {453025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-32)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {897478/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-2)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Delegates Kramer, Mautz, and Davis
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Senators Pugh, Middleton, and Jennings
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-39)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-6)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments {533892/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Special Order until next session (Delegate Kittleman) Adopted 46
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Kramer) {453025/1 Adopted 47
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (105-32) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Finance 47A
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable with Amendments {897478/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-2) 56
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 House Requests Senate Recede 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Delegates Kramer, Mautz, and Davis 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Senate Refuses to Recede 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Senators Pugh, Middleton, and Jennings 60
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (100-39) 69
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (39-6) 65
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 10-104, 10-110, 10-111, 10-115, 10-132, 10-401, 10-402, 10-403, 10-404, 10-405, 10-406 through 10-415, 10-901 through 10-912, 1-101, 2.5-101, 2.5-102, 2.5-103, 2.5-104, 2.5-105, 2.5-106, 2.5-107, 2.5-108, 2.5-109, 2.5-110, 2.5-201, 2.5-202, 2.5-203, 2.5-204, 2.5-205, 2.5-206, 2.5-207, 2-101, 2-102, 2-103, 2-104 through 2-107, 2-108, 2-109 through 2-111, 2-112, 2-113, 2-114, 2-115, 2-116, 2-117 through 2-123, 2-201 through 2-207, 3-201, 3-202, 3-203, 3-204, 3-205, 5-601 through 5-603, 6-501, 6-502, 6-503, 6-504 through 6-508, 6-509, 6-510, 6-511 through 6-514, 6-515, 6-516, 6-517 through 6-523, 6-524, 6-525, 6-526 through 6-529, 9-101 )
(   8-201, 9-3101 through 9-3104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM