Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Patient Referrals - Oncologists - Radiation Therapy Services and Nondiagnostic Computer Tomography Scan Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, Impallaria, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Oaks, Reznik, Saab, Sample-Hughes, and West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "in-office ancillary services" to include specified oncology group practices or offices of oncologists that provide specified radiation therapy services or computer tomography services; providing that specified prohibitions on referrals do not apply to a referral by specified oncologists for specified radiation therapy services or computer tomography services; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0539
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-301, 1-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM