Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Gutierrez, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death Act; providing for the construction of the Act; authorizing an individual to transfer specified property to one or more beneficiaries effective at the transferor's death by a transfer on death deed; establishing that a transfer on death deed is revocable and nontestamentary; providing that the capacity required to make or revoke a transfer on death deed is the same as that required to make a will; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/07/2013 Text - First -
4/09/2013 Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-101 through 18-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM