Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/22/2021 1:42:47 PM
Friday, January 22, 2021
Friday, January 22, 2021
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: January 22, 2021 1:18 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0458
Sen Feldman

Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
ADDED: 1:18 PM
SB0465
Sen West

Maryland Medical Assistance Programs - Dental Providers and Dental Students - Reimbursement
ADDED: 1:18 PM
SB0469
Sen Washington

Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Applied Behavior Analysis Services – Reimbursement
ADDED: 1:18 PM

House
Early Childhood Subcommittee
Change made: January 22, 2021 10:07 AM - HEARING ADDED
Early Childhood Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
January 26, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0237
Del Ebersole

State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
HB0405
Del Lopez

Special Education - Judicial Actions - Attorney's Fees and Related Costs

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: January 22, 2021 10:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
February 2, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
-Briefing on COVID-19 Vaccine Distribution

Change made: January 22, 2021 10:51 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2021 3:45 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 2, 2021 1:30 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
HB0029
Del Ivey

Health - Standards for Involuntary Admissions and Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - Substance Use Disorder
HB0108
Del Charkoudian

Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services – Modifications
HB0022
Del Love

Environment - PFAS Chemicals - Prohibitions and Requirements
HB0276
Del Henson

Congregate Care Facilities - Visitation
HB0463
Del Barron

Maryland Health Equity Resource Act
HB0484
Del Cullison

Health Care Facilities - Dialysis Treatment Services - Training (David Selby Dialysis Parity Act)

Change made: January 22, 2021 11:54 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 17, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0454
Del D. Barnes

State and Local Procurement - Payment Practices
HB0469
Del Forbes

State-Funded Construction and Major Renovation Projects - Solar Panels - Requirement
HB0509
Del Acevero

9-1-1 Specialists - Classification as First Responders
HB0527
St. Mary's County Delegation

St. Mary’s County Human Relations Commission – Equal Treatment
HB0533
Del Acevero

State Government – Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention
HB0542
Del C. Watson

Emergency Management - Chief Resilience Officer - Appointment and Duties
HB0587
Del R. Watson

Department of Information Technology - Status of Information Technology and Cybersecurity in State Agencies - Reports
HB0650
Del Boyce

Minority Business Enterprises - Sexual and Gender Minorities (Imari's Business Pride Act)

Change made: January 22, 2021 11:54 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 24, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0535
Del Acevero

Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act
HB0540
Del Morgan

Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
HB0600
Del Belcastro

State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech–Language Pathologists – Duties, Appointment of Members, and Requirements for Licensees
HB0604
Del Kipke

Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting

Housing and Real Property Subcommittee
Change made: January 22, 2021 9:58 AM - HEARING ADDED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Work Session
January 27, 2021 5:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Exact time of subcommittee meeting will be announced after Bill Hearings are complete

Judiciary Committee
Change made: January 22, 2021 12:55 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
February 4, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0580
Del D.M. Davis

Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Repeal
ADDED: 12:55 PM
HB0646
Del Valentino-Smith

Child Abuse and Neglect - Memorandum of Understanding With Military Family Advocacy Program
ADDED: 12:55 PM

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 22, 2021 11:09 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 4, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0654
Del Qi

Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program
ADDED: 11:09 AM