Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Anderson, Arora, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Beidle, Bobo, Branch, Braveboy, Cardin, Carr, Clagett, Clippinger, Cluster, Conway, Cullison, Eckardt, Frank, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glass, Glenn, Griffith, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Haddaway-Riccio, Healey, Hixson, Hough, Howard, Hucker, Ivey, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Lafferty, Lee, Love, Luedtke, Malone, McComas, McIntosh, A. Miller, Mitchell, Mizeur, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, S. Robinson, Schuh, Smigiel, Sophocleus, Stein, Swain, Tarrant, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilson, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Excluding as a father of a child, for purposes of specified provisions relating to the paternity of a child in a guardian or adoption proceeding, a man who has committed a specified sexual crime against the child's mother; requiring a court to consider a specified statement when making a specified finding; prohibiting a court from requiring publication of specified information under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0411
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0715 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/06/2014 Text - First - Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-306, 5-3A-06, 5-3B-05, 9-101.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM