Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer and W. Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying that a certain insurer that offers or sells a travel insurance policy is required to pay a certain premium tax on certain premiums paid by certain persons; requiring travel insurance to be classified and filed as inland marine insurance; specifying the state of residence for different types of policies; providing that eligibility and underwriting standards for travel insurance may be developed and provided based on certain travel protection plans and certain applicable provisions of law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {183892/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {547475/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {183892/1 Adopted 48
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Finance 48C
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable with Amendments {547475/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Text - Chapter - Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 1-101, 11-801, 19-1001 through 19-1007, 6-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM