Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Maryland Commission on Efficiency in Government
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, Hornberger, Impallaria, Kelly, Kipke, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, W. Miller, Morgan, Reznik, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating the Maryland Commission on Efficiency in Government; specifying the duties of the Commission; providing for the membership, election of a chair, quorum, terms, and reimbursement of members of the Commission; authorizing the appointment of an Executive Director; specifying the duties of the Executive Director; requiring the assignment of an Assistant Attorney General to the Commission for a specified purpose; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-3101 through 9-3111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM