Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Horse Racing Act - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee and Delegates Barve, Boteler, Harper, Ivey, Luedtke, Stukes, and Walker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending to July 1, 2024, the date on which the Maryland Horse Racing Act terminates; and requiring that an evaluation be made of the State Racing Commission and specified advisory committees on or before December 15, 2021.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0527
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2014 3/05/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 41
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Second Reading Passed 41
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 43
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Finance 41A
Senate 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1101, 11-1102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM