Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Atterbeary, Beidle, Carr, Chang, Cullison, Ebersole, Fennell, Gaines, Healey, Hill, Holmes, Hornberger, C. Howard, Jameson, Kaiser, Kittleman, Krimm, Lam, Lierman, Long, Luedtke, McDonough, Moon, Morhaim, Platt, Rosenberg, Shoemaker, Smith, Sophocleus, Tarlau, Walker, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education and the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with specified other organizations, to establish specified guidelines for the training of trained diabetes care providers; providing for the content of the guidelines; requiring each county board of education to require specified public schools to establish a Student Diabetes Management Program in the school; providing that specified nonpublic schools may establish a Student Diabetes Management Program in the school; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0672
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-437, 7-438 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM