Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Statute of Limitations - Residential Leases Signed Under Seal
Sponsored by
Delegates Waldstreicher, Barve, Holmes, Jalisi, Carr, and Beidle
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying the time period within which a civil action on a residential lease that has been signed under seal must be filed; and declaring that it is the intent of the General Assembly to clarify that an action for rent arrears under any kind of residential lease must be filed in compliance with specified provisions of law.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1077
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0971 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Statute of Limitations - Residential Leases Signed Under Seal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {760816/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Statute of Limitations - Residential Leases Signed Under Seal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-11)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Statute of Limitations - Residential Leases Signed Under Seal
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {760816/1 Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Statute of Limitations - Residential Leases Signed Under Seal
House 3/13/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (125-11) 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 44
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM