Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsored by
Delegate Chang
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the salary of the Sheriff of Anne Arundel County; and providing that the Act does not apply to the salary or compensation of the Sheriff while serving in a term of office beginning before the effective date of the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-2)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (129-2) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/16/2020 6:06 PM