Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Striped Bass Permits - Annual Fees
Sponsored by
Delegates Jacobs, Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Carozza, Ghrist, Kipke, Mautz, Otto, Szeliga, Beidle, and Cassilly
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the annual fee for the commercial striped bass permit; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {770714/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Favorable with Amendments {770714/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 45
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM