Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recreational Hunting and Fishing License Applications - Voter Registration
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz, Adams, Beitzel, Buckel, Carey, Carozza, Fisher, Flanagan, Gutierrez, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, McDonough, Metzgar, Reilly, Rey, Shoemaker, Sophocleus, Vitale, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections and the Department of Natural Resources to jointly develop and implement procedures for persons who apply for the issuance or renewal of a recreational hunting or fishing license online to be offered the opportunity to register to vote through a link to Maryland's Online Voter Registration System; and prohibiting the Department of Natural Resources from being deemed a voter registration agency for the purposes of providing, accepting, and forwarding voter registration applications.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM