Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Portable Electronics Insurance - Compensation of Employees of Vendor, Disclosures to Customers, and Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Jameson and Love
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a vendor of portable electronics insurance or an authorized representative of the vendor may compensate employees of the vendor or authorized representative in a specified manner; altering the content of disclosures that a vendor of portable electronics insurance must provide to customers under specified circumstances; requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to make specified determinations and review specified laws, practices, guidelines, and standards relating to limited lines insurance; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0682
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {433299/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments {433299/1 Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-703, 10-705 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM