Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 717
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the standards and procedures applicable to the expungement of public driving records by the Motor Vehicle Administration; prohibiting the Administration from expunging specified driving record entries; and requiring the Administration to adopt specified regulations.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-5)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {228679/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Frick) Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 717
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-5) 42
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 41
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {228679/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Frick) Adopted 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 717
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-117.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM