Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Former Members - Member Contributions
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that certain active members of the Employees' Pension System or the Teachers' Pension System who are subject to the Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit earn a certain rate of interest on certain former member contributions in the Alternate Contributory Pension Selection under certain circumstances; applying the Act retroactively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0699
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {619837/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2018
Legislative Date
5/25/2018
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Former Members - Member Contributions
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Former Members - Member Contributions
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 43
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {619837/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 55
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 55
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Former Members - Member Contributions
Post Passage 5/25/2018 5/25/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM