Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pensions, Joint Committee On

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0164 /CH0248 (SB0176/CH0249)
Title
Judges' Retirement System - Mandatory Retirement Age - Clarification of Eligibility for Allowance
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1012 /CH0727 (SB0899/CH0728)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1018 /CH0723 (SB0784/CH0724)
Title
Pensions - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Limitation and Calculation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1019 (SB0699/CH0509)
Title
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Former Members - Member Contributions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1020 (SB0178)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - Oath
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0176 /CH0249 (HB0164/CH0248)
Title
Judges' Retirement System - Mandatory Retirement Age - Clarification of Eligibility for Allowance
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178 (HB1020)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System – Board of Trustees – Oath
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0699 /CH0509 (HB1019)
Title
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection – Former Members – Member Contributions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 /CH0724 (HB1018/CH0723)
Title
Pensions - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Limitation and Calculation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0899 /CH0728 (HB1012/CH0727)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0164 /CH0248 (SB0176/CH0249) Judges' Retirement System - Mandatory Retirement Age - Clarification of Eligibility for Allowance By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Appropriations
2/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 AM
HB1012 /CH0727 (SB0899/CH0728) State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 727
Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 AM
HB1018 /CH0723 (SB0784/CH0724) Pensions - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Limitation and Calculation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 723
Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 AM
HB1019 (SB0699/CH0509) Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Former Members - Member Contributions By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 AM
HB1020 (SB0178) State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - Oath By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0176 /CH0249 (HB0164/CH0248) Judges' Retirement System - Mandatory Retirement Age - Clarification of Eligibility for Allowance By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2018 - 9:30 AM
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0178 (HB1020) State Retirement and Pension System – Board of Trustees – Oath By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2018 - 9:30 AM
Appropriations
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0699 /CH0509 (HB1019) Alternate Contributory Pension Selection – Former Members – Member Contributions By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 509
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2018 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0784 /CH0724 (HB1018/CH0723) Pensions - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Limitation and Calculation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 724
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2018 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0899 /CH0728 (HB1012/CH0727) State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 728
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2018 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM