Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Debt Collection - Statute of Limitations (Maryland Zombie Debt Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Gutierrez, Barkley, Bobo, Branch, Braveboy, Carr, Carter, Conaway, Cullison, Gilchrist, Glass, Glenn, Howard, Hucker, A. Kelly, Kramer, McHale, A. Miller, Mizeur, Myers, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Stocksdale, Stukes, F. Turner, Valderrama, A. Washington, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a collector from initiating contact with a debtor or a person related to the debtor under specified circumstances; requiring a collector who is collecting or attempting to collect a debt for which the statute of limitations has expired to inform a debtor of specified information in specified communications; and prohibiting a court from entering a judgment by default against a specified debtor under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-201, 14-202, 14-203, 14-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM