Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales
Sponsored by
Delegate Oaks (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Delegates Anderson, Carter, Clippinger, Hammen, Haynes, Lierman, McIntosh, and Rosenberg
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the tax collector in Baltimore City to withhold specified owner-occupied residential property from a tax sale when the taxes on the property are under $750; exempting a person redeeming specified owner-occupied residential property in Baltimore City from the requirement that the person pay the tax collector any taxes, interest, and penalties accruing after the date of the tax sale; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0439
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {665469/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-4)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {665469/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (133-4) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47A
Senate 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-801, 14-811, 14-828, 14-833, 14-843, 14-844, 14-849.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM