Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Jacobs, Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Carozza, Ghrist, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Kipke, Mautz, Otto, Szeliga, Cassilly, and Jalisi
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the offense for taking oysters with gear that is prohibited in a specified area; establishing an offense for taking oysters with a power dredge in a specified area; altering the administrative penalties that apply to a person for knowingly committing specified offenses related to oyster poaching by requiring under the Department of Natural Resources under specified circumstances to suspend the person's oyster license for 1 year under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0696
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {920213/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Favorable with Amendments {920213/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 45A
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM