Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Multiple Murders
Sponsored by
Delegates McDonough, Boteler, Glass, Impallaria, Love, McComas, and Parrott
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement for the State to give notice to a defendant of the intention to seek a sentence of death if the defendant committed more than one murder in the first degree arising out of the same incident; requiring that a separate sentencing proceeding be held as soon as practicable after a defendant is found guilty of murder in the first degree to determine whether the defendant will be sentenced to death if the defendant committed more than one murder in the first degree arising out of the same incident; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-202, 2-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM