Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hunting - Use of Motorized Vehicles - Wounded or Disabled Military
Sponsored by
Delegates Beitzel, Adams, Anderton, Buckel, Glass, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Jalisi, Kittleman, Krebs, Mautz, McKay, Metzgar, Otto, Saab, Simonaire, and Vogt
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person who is a wounded or service-connected disabled member of the armed forces or a service-connected disabled veteran to use while hunting an off-road vehicle or a motorized wheelchair to go to or from a hunting stand or location or to retrieve game; and requiring regulations adopted by the Secretary of Natural Resources to authorize the operation in a specified manner of off-road vehicles or motorized wheelchairs on property owned or controlled by the Department of Natural Resources.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/14/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-410, 5-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM