Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Earned Income Credit - Refundability
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Lierman, Platt, Turner, Walker, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, to 28% for tax year 2016 and 30% for tax years 2017 and beyond, the percentage of the federal earned income credit used to determine the amount that an individual may claim as a refundable credit under the Maryland earned income credit.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0295
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM