Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/27/2020 4:42:59 PM
Monday, January 27, 2020
Monday, January 27, 2020
Senate
Capital Budget Subcommittee
Change made: January 27, 2020 3:12 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 2, 2020 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Capital Department of Juvenile Services
REMOVED: 3:12 PM

Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: January 27, 2020 3:59 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
February 5, 2020 2:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0281
The Pres (Admin), et al

Renewable Energy Development and Siting (REDS) – Evaluations and Tax and Fee Exemptions
ADDED: 2:18 PM
REMOVED: 3:59 PM
SB0295
Sen Hough

Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops
ADDED: 2:18 PM
REMOVED: 3:59 PM
SB0300
Sen Lam, et al

Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
ADDED: 2:18 PM
REMOVED: 3:59 PM
SB0353
Sen Edwards

Black Bear Damage Reimbursement Fund - Pets
ADDED: 2:18 PM
REMOVED: 3:59 PM
SB0371
Sen Carter, et al

Environment - Drinking Water Outlets in School Buildings - Testing for Elevated Level of Lead
ADDED: 2:18 PM
REMOVED: 3:59 PM

Change made: January 27, 2020 4:00 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
February 11, 2020 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0281
The Pres (Admin), et al

Renewable Energy Development and Siting (REDS) – Evaluations and Tax and Fee Exemptions
ADDED: 4:00 PM
SB0295
Sen Hough

Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops
ADDED: 4:00 PM
SB0300
Sen Lam, et al

Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
ADDED: 4:00 PM
SB0353
Sen Edwards

Black Bear Damage Reimbursement Fund - Pets
ADDED: 4:00 PM
SB0371
Sen Carter, et al

Environment - Drinking Water Outlets in School Buildings - Testing for Elevated Level of Lead
ADDED: 4:00 PM

Executive Nominations Committee
Change made: January 27, 2020 11:21 AM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Appear
January 27, 2020 5:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

Change made: January 27, 2020 11:26 AM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Not Appear
January 27, 2020 5:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

Finance Committee
Change made: January 27, 2020 9:04 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
January 29, 2020 2:45 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0226
Sen Waldstreicher

Highways - Prohibition on Outdoor Signs Along Expressways - Exception
REMOVED: 9:04 AM

Change made: January 27, 2020 3:57 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 11, 2020 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0308
Sen Kagan

Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Chief Executive Officer
REMOVED: 3:57 PM

Change made: January 27, 2020 12:28 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 13, 2020 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0366
Sen Ready

Carroll County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors
ADDED: 12:28 PM

Change made: January 27, 2020 9:05 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 19, 2020 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0226
Sen Waldstreicher

Highways - Prohibition on Outdoor Signs Along Expressways - Exception
ADDED: 9:05 AM

Health Subcommittee
Change made: January 27, 2020 11:42 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health Subcommittee - Other
January 29, 2020 4:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0103 - Health Occupations - Diagnostic Evaluation and Treatment of Patients - Disciplinary Actions (The Patient's Access to Integrative Healthcare Act of 2020)

House
Capital Budget Subcommittee
Change made: January 27, 2020 3:12 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 5, 2020 4:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Capital Department of Juvenile Services
REMOVED: 3:12 PM

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: January 27, 2020 3:25 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
January 29, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Highway Safety Update
ADDED: 3:25 PM

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: January 27, 2020 12:09 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 11, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0502
Del Lierman, et al

Public Information Act - Revisions
ADDED: 12:09 PM

Judiciary Committee
Change made: January 27, 2020 10:35 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
February 12, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0401
Del Barron, et al

Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act)
ADDED: 10:35 AM