Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A Licenses
Sponsored by
Delegates Barkley, Aumann, Branch, Brooks, Davis, Frick, Jameson, Lisanti, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, subject to specified conditions, to two the number of Class A alcoholic beverages licenses that may be issued in the State to any individual for a specified use; and clarifying that, with a specified exception, no more than one license may be issued in any single county or Baltimore City to an individual or to an establishment that derives less than 85% of revenue from the sale of alcoholic beverages.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0300
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/13/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-102, 9-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM