Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Accommodations
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Branch, Carr, Cullison, Dumais, Frick, Gutierrez, Kaiser, Luedtke, Moon, Platt, S. Robinson, Turner, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying the definition of "taxable price" for the State sales and use tax as it applies to the sale or use of an accommodation facilitated by an accommodations intermediary to include the full amount of the consideration paid by a buyer for the sale or use of an accommodation, but not including any tax that is remitted to a taxing authority; altering the definition of "vendor" under the State sales and use tax to include an accommodations intermediary; defining specified terms; and making a conforming change.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0190
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {825667/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/6 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Bromwell) {333328/1 Rejected (30-110)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {513721/1 Rejected (51-87)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {343228/1 Rejected (51-84)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Mautz) {873321/1 Rejected (53-83)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Morgan) {963829/1 Rejected (51-86)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (83-56)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {825667/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Special Order until 4/6 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted 60
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Bromwell) {333328/1 Rejected (30-110) 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {513721/1 Rejected (51-87) 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {343228/1 Rejected (51-84) 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Mautz) {873321/1 Rejected (53-83) 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Morgan) {963829/1 Rejected (51-86) 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (83-56) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 60
Senate 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM