Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Investment Program – Work Activity Requirement – Authorized Activities and Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Lierman, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Services to allow an applicant for or recipient of assistance under the Family Investment Program to meet a work activity requirement by participating in vocational education for a minimum of 20 hours per week that leads to an associate degree, a diploma, or a certificate, or 20 hours per week of education directly related to employment; requiring the Department to report certain information to the General Assembly by October 1 of each year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0969
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {464564/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {347375/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Family Investment Program - Transitional Assistance for Education Pilot Program
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Hearing canceled
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {464564/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Family Investment Program – Work Activity Requirement – Authorized Activities and Report
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {347375/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Family Investment Program – Work Activity Requirement – Authorized Activities and Report
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Text - Chapter - Family Investment Program – Work Activity Requirement – Authorized Activities and Report
(   5-301, 5-308, 5-322 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page