Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public School Employees - Whistleblower Protection - Civil Actions
Sponsored by
Delegates Ivey, Acevero, Attar, Cain, Charles, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fennell, Guyton, Smith, Washington, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a prerequisite that a public school employee who is subject to a certain prohibited personnel action relating to an act of whistleblowing must exhaust any administrative remedies before instituting a civil action against a public school employer; requiring a public school employer to provide an administrative remedial process and to complete the process within 30 days after the employee files an initial complaint; requiring a public school employee to notify the superintendent of schools of any intent to file a civil action; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public School Employees - Whistleblower Protection - Civil Actions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {635967/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public School Employees - Whistleblower Protection - Civil Actions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-30)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public School Employees - Whistleblower Protection - Civil Actions
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {635967/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public School Employees - Whistleblower Protection - Civil Actions
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (103-30) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51AClick to view Recorded Media
(   6-901 through 6-903, 6-904 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:18 PM
Click to return on the top page