Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Station Safety Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Transit Administration Station Pilot Program to provide law enforcement officers at transit stations to enhance public safety; requiring a law enforcement officer to be on duty during certain hours; requiring the Administration to implement the pilot program at certain transit stations under its jurisdiction; requiring the Governor to provide funds for the Program in the State budget; requiring by December 1, 2019, the Administration to submit a certain report to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Station Attendants - Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {730914/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Transit Administration - Station Safety Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Station Attendants - Pilot Program
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {730914/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Maryland Transit Administration - Station Safety Pilot Program
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48B
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM