Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh, Olszewski, Bobo, Carr, Cullison, Frush, Hammen, Hucker, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Love, A. Miller, Morhaim, Reznik, S. Robinson, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a beverage distributor operating within the State to register with the Department of the Environment on or before April 1, 2014; requiring a redeemable beverage container sold in the State to bear specified information indicating a refund value of 5 cents beginning October 1, 2014; requiring the payment of specified deposits by specified distributors, retailers, and consumers under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0641
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters and Economic Matters
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1733 through 9-1741 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM