Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Compassionate Care Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, McIntosh, Hixson, Barve, Branch, Holmes, Tarrant, Cane, Feldman, Barnes, F. Turner, McHale, Rosenberg, Kaiser, Boteler, Weir, Frank, Aumann, Hubbard, Clagett, Donoghue, Lafferty, Smigiel, Braveboy, Hucker, Kach, Ivey, Glenn, Love, Stein, Vaughn, Haynes, Gutierrez, Carr, Cullison, Stukes, Bobo, Cardin, M. Washington, A. Kelly, Lee, Reznik, Kramer, Gilchrist, Frush, B. Robinson, Valderrama, Zucker, Conaway, Carter, Wilson, Glass, Oaks, Luedtke, S. Robinson, Mizeur, Niemann, Summers, A. Miller, Murphy, V. Turner, Nathan-Pulliam, Minnick, and Arora
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing an independent Medical Marijuana Oversight Commission; providing for the purpose and membership of the Commission; providing for the terms of the members of the Commission; providing for the appointment of a chair and vice chair of the Commission; requiring the Commission to adopt certain regulations; requiring the Commission to establish a registration program to register dispensing pharmacies, dispensing centers, and academic medical centers; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3101 through 13-3116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM