Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Waterworks and Waste Systems Operators - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 719
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Waterworks and Waste Systems Operators to set certain fees so as to produce funds sufficient to cover certain costs of regulating waterworks, wastewater works, and industrial wastewater works in accordance with certain provisions of law; continuing the Board in accordance with the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2031, the termination provisions relating to statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0585
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Reassigned to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 719
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - State Board of Waterworks and Waste Systems Operators - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Reassigned to Environment and Transportation 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Waterworks and Waste Systems Operators - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 719
Text - Chapter - State Board of Waterworks and Waste Systems Operators - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation
(   12-206, 12-602 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page