Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Police Officers - Warrantless Arrests
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified Baltimore City police officer without a warrant to arrest a person suspected of committing battery against a specified Baltimore City special enforcement officer, special parking enforcement officer, or special traffic enforcement officer under specified circumstances; and requiring a specified police officer to consider whether a person acted in self-defense if mutual battery is suspected.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {828478/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments {828478/1 Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13) 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM