Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Economic Development Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Delegates Clagett, Barkley, Barve, Beidle, Conway, DeBoy, Donoghue, Elliott, Frick, Gaines, Jameson, Kaiser, A. Miller, Myers, Olszewski, Schulz, Stocksdale, F. Turner, Walker, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the State corporate income tax rate; allocating a portion of the corporate income tax to the Transportation Infrastructure Bank established under the Act; establishing the Transportation Infrastructure Bank; requiring that money in the Bank be held in a special, nonlapsing, revolving loan fund in the Transportation Trust Fund; specifying the contents of the Bank; requiring the money in the Bank to be used to finance specified types of transportation infrastructure projects; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105, 2-614.1, 2-615 )
(   9-101 through 9-901 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM