Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Commissioners - Compensation Study PG/MC 107-16
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission to contract with an independent consultant to conduct a study of the commissioners' compensation; requiring the Commission to fund the cost of the study; prohibiting the cost from exceeding $10,000; requiring the consultant to analyze and compare specified matters, consult with specified persons, and make recommendations; requiring the consultant to report to specified persons on or before October 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM