Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Prince George's County Delegation & Montgomery Co Deleg

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 /CH0731
Title
Montgomery County - Municipal Authority to Regulate Structures - Clarification PG/MC 112-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1025
Title
Prince George's County - Land Use - Zoning Powers and Review PG/MC 111-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1027
Title
Prince George's County - Land Use Permit Review - Consolidation PG/MC 110-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1123 /CH0500
Title
Maryland-Washington Metropolitan District - Boundaries - City of Greenbelt PG/MC 117-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1124
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures PG/MC 118-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1125
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Members - Annual Salary PG/MC 106-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1128 /CH0501
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Drinking Water - Testing PG/MC 113-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1129 /CH0502
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Commissioners Appointed From Montgomery County - Qualifications PG/MC 116-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1131
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Budget Approval PG/MC 104-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1132
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Board of Ethics - Subpoena Power PG/MC 105-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1133
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Commissioners - Compensation Study PG/MC 107-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1140
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Ratemaking Structure - Review by Office of Legislative Audits PG/MC 108-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1197
Title
Prince George's County - Forest Conservation Act - Net Tract Area PG/MC 114-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1198 /CH0304
Title
Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Extraordinary Development District PG/MC 109-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1552
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 115-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1575
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Service Rates PG/MC 119-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1024 /CH0731 Montgomery County - Municipal Authority to Regulate Structures - Clarification PG/MC 112-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 731
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1025 Prince George's County - Land Use - Zoning Powers and Review PG/MC 111-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1027 Prince George's County - Land Use Permit Review - Consolidation PG/MC 110-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1123 /CH0500 Maryland-Washington Metropolitan District - Boundaries - City of Greenbelt PG/MC 117-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1124 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures PG/MC 118-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1125 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Members - Annual Salary PG/MC 106-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1128 /CH0501 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Drinking Water - Testing PG/MC 113-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1129 /CH0502 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Commissioners Appointed From Montgomery County - Qualifications PG/MC 116-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1131 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Budget Approval PG/MC 104-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1132 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Board of Ethics - Subpoena Power PG/MC 105-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1133 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Commissioners - Compensation Study PG/MC 107-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1140 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Ratemaking Structure - Review by Office of Legislative Audits PG/MC 108-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1197 Prince George's County - Forest Conservation Act - Net Tract Area PG/MC 114-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1198 /CH0304 Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Extraordinary Development District PG/MC 109-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1552 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 115-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1575 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Service Rates PG/MC 119-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM