Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - State Highway Rights-of-Way - Tree Planting and Signs
Sponsored by
Delegates Wivell, McKay, Beidle, Cassilly, Folden, Jacobs, and Otto
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting in Washington County tree planting in a specified State highway right-of-way to implement a State Watershed Implementation Plan under specified circumstances; requiring the State Highway Administration to negotiate in good faith with commercial property owners in Washington County regarding the placement of directional or promotional signs in State highway rights-of-way; requiring the Administration to coordinate efforts to minimize the fiscal impact on the Transportation Trust Fund; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {300615/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Washington County - State Highway Rights-of-Way - Tree Planting and Signs
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments {300615/1 Adopted 52
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Washington County - State Highway Rights-of-Way - Tree Planting and Signs
House 3/22/2017 3/19/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 53
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Referred Rules 50
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-801 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM