Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Welfare Fund - Telephone Financial Assistance
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Boteler, Braveboy, Cane, Carr, Conaway, Cullison, Fisher, Gutierrez, Haynes, Ivey, Jones, K. Kelly, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, A. Miller, W. Miller, Mitchell, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, B. Robinson, Simmons, Stukes, Tarrant, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Vallario, Waldstreicher, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to adopt specified regulations regarding the use of profits derived from telephone commissions; requiring that specified commissions be used for telephone calls that take place between an inmate and the minor child of an inmate; requiring that distributions be made according to the financial need of an inmate; requiring the submission of a specified report; and requiring a specified audit of each Inmate Welfare Fund.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0778
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-501, 10-502, 10-503, 10-504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM