Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Education - Financial Literacy Course and Exam - Graduation Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Shoemaker, Buckel, Clark, Howard, Kittleman, Krebs, Parrott, Reilly, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to develop curriculum content for a one-half credit course in financial literacy on or before July 1, 2020; requiring each county board of education to implement the financial literacy curriculum content developed by the State Board in public high schools beginning in the 2020-2021 school year; and requiring students to complete a financial literacy course and pass an exam in order to graduate from high school.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Board of Education - Financial Literacy Course and Exam - Graduation Requirement
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205.5 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM