Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs - Participating Pharmacies
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke, Bromwell, Cullison, Kelly, Krebs, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Reznik, and Saab
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the conditions under which insurers, nonprofit health service plans, or health maintenance organizations may require a covered specialty drug to be obtained through a pharmacy participating in the provider network of the insurer, nonprofit health service plan, or health maintenance organization; altering the definition of "specialty drug"; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0871
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2015 2/19/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-847 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM