Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Mobile Beauty Salons and Practice Location Requirement Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "beauty salon" to include a specified mobile beauty salon; requiring an applicant for a specified beauty salon permit to lease or own the motor vehicle or trailer in which a specified mobile beauty salon is located for which a specified application is made; repealing specified provisions of law that prohibit a person from practicing cosmetology, providing esthetic services, providing hair services, or providing nail technician services in specified locations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2015 3/17/2015 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM