Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
Sponsored by
Frederick County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the annual salary of the State's Attorney for Frederick County; requiring the salary of the State's Attorney for Frederick County to increase in a percentage equal to the average annual increment and salary adjustment given to Frederick County employees over the State's Attorney's prior 4-year term; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0827
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Frederick County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Frederick County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Frederick County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - Frederick County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 49
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:33 AM