Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Carter, Dumais, McDermott, Smigiel, Swain, and Vallario
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a court or clerk's office that is in session or open on a weekend or holiday for a specified purpose is not in session or open for any other purpose or function; repealing a provision of law authorizing a District Court commissioner to set bond or commit persons to jail in default of bond or release them on personal recognizance if circumstances warrant; requiring a police officer to submit a specified statement of charges, serve a statement and summons, and release the defendant under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {672315/4 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {803320/1 Rejected (53-81)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Schulz) {803322/1 Rejected (59-76)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-40)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {672315/4 Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Special Order until later today (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {803320/1 Rejected (53-81) 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Schulz) {803322/1 Rejected (59-76) 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (94-40) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101.2, 4-101.3, 5-201, 5-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM