Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance and Discount Medical Plans - Vision Care Services and Materials
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified organizations from using in their advertisements, marketing material, brochures, and discount cards a specified term in a specified context; prohibiting specified organizations from selling, marketing, or soliciting a specified plan under specified circumstances; prohibiting specified provider contracts from containing a specified provision; prohibiting specified carriers from including in specified contracts a specified provision; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0811
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-601, 14-606, 15-112.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM