Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Program to Improve Employee to Supervisor Ratio and Employee Span of Control Review Board
Sponsored by
Delegates Frick, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Jones, B. Robinson, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management, in collaboration with the heads of units in the Executive Branch of State government, to establish a program to improve the ratio of Executive Branch employees to supervisors beginning on specified dates; requiring the Secretary to waive program requirements under specified circumstances; providing that the program requirements do not apply if federal requirements exist; establishing the Employee Span of Control Review Board; providing for the membership of the Board; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0724
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/02/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM