Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Hammen, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Rose, Saab, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions of law relating to a surviving spouse making an election to take a specified share of the net estate of the decedent instead of the property left to the surviving spouse under the will; providing that a surviving spouse may take a specified elective share amount of a specified augmented estate; establishing the priority to be used in determining the sources from which a specified elective share amount is payable; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0913
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {656689/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-3)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {656689/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (132-3) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14.5-604, 3-201, 3-203 through 3-208, 3-401 through 3-411, 6-306, 7-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM