Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Amnesty Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Walker, Hixson, Turner, Kaiser, Luedtke, Afzali, D. Barnes, Buckel, Fennell, Hornberger, C. Howard, Long, Metzgar, Patterson, Platt, Reilly, Simonaire, Shoemaker, Tarlau, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to declare an amnesty period for delinquent taxpayers from September 1, 2015, through October 30, 2015, for civil penalties and half the interest attributable to nonpayment, nonreporting, or underreporting of specified taxes under specified circumstances; authorizing the Comptroller to enter into agreements to provide a specified waiver under specified circumstances; providing that the amnesty program does not apply to specified taxpayers under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0763
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {335462/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {649039/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Favorable with Amendments {335462/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Favorable with Amendments {649039/1 Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 54
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 61
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 61
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM