Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Libraries - Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped - Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Anderson, Barkley, Barve, Boteler, Braveboy, Clippinger, Cluster, Cullison, DeBoy, Dumais, Eckardt, Elliott, Frank, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gaines, George, Gilchrist, Harper, Healey, Hough, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kramer, Krebs, Lee, Love, Luedtke, Malone, McMillan, A. Miller, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, O'Donnell, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sophocleus, Stukes, Summers, Swain, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Weir, Wilson, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Department of Education to include operating funds for the Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped in its budget; requiring the Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped to receive a specified amount of funding beginning in fiscal year 2016 and in each fiscal year thereafter; requiring the Department to disburse funds to the Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0419
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {985163/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Robey) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {985163/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Second Reading Passed 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Robey) Adopted 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM